EP0075761 - Clothes peg for fastening laundry onto clothes lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dirschnabel, Hans-Peter Lessingstrasse 5 D-7314 Wernau/N. / DE | [1983/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Rüger, Rudolf, et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Rüger Dipl.-Ing. H.P. Barthelt Webergasse 3 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. R. Rüger Dipl.-Ing. H.P. Barthelt Webergasse 3 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108313.6 | 09.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | DE19813138418 | 26.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3138418 | [1983/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075761 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075761 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | D06F55/00 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
D06F55/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/14] | Title | German: | Wäscheklammer zum Befestigen von Wäsche auf Wäscheleinen | [1983/14] | English: | Clothes peg for fastening laundry onto clothes lines | [1983/14] | French: | Pince à linge pour la fixation de linge sur des cordes à linge | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 17.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.10.1982 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | 11.10.1982 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | 11.10.1982 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | 11.10.1982 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | 11.10.1982 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | 11.10.1982 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | 11.10.1982 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | 11.10.1982 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | 11.10.1982 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   23.11.1982 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.11.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 31.01.1986 | LU | 30.09.1986 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/14] | SE | 31.01.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1997712U (WOLF HANS ING [DE]); | [AD]DE1585685 (ESPOSITO JOHN VINCENT); | [AD]DE7225759U ; | [AD]DE8001988U |