EP0075763 - Circuit generating a D.C. output voltage free of voltage variations of the D.C. supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilhelm, Wilhelm, Dr. Ing. Geigenbergerstrasse 23 D-8000 München 71 / DE | [1983/14] | Application number, filing date | 82108370.6 | 10.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | DE19813137451 | 21.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3137451 | [1983/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0075763 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0075763 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075763 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/20 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
G05F3/227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/14] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung einer von Schwankungen einer Versorgungsgleichspannung unabhängigen Ausgangsgleichspannung | [1983/14] | English: | Circuit generating a D.C. output voltage free of voltage variations of the D.C. supply | [1983/14] | French: | Circuit générant une tension de sortie continue indépendante des variations de la tension d'alimentation | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 06.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2533199 (SIEMENS AG); | [AD]DE2849153 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2849231 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]GB2068608 (PHILIPS NV) | [AD] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID STATE CIRCUITS, Band SC-7, 1972, Seiten 267-269, New York, (USA) |