Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1986 [1986/19] |
16.03.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.1985 [1985/20] |
25.03.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.05.1983 [1983/21] |
29.01.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.03.1983 [1983/13] |