Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE13360T | 15.06.1985 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE8127522 | 19.09.1981 | DE8203188 | 06.02.1982 | EP82108484 | 15.09.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3263550D1 | 20.06.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE8127522 | 19.09.1981 | DE3263550 | 15.09.1982 | DE8203188 | 06.02.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8127522U | 18.02.1982 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE8127522 | 19.09.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8203188U | 04.11.1982 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE8203188 | 06.02.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5865413 | 19.04.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE8127522 | 19.09.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU564019B | Global Dossier | 30.07.1987 | B2 | AU8846182 | 31.03.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE8127522 | 19.09.1981 | DE8203188 | 06.02.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0075260 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1985 | B1 | EP0075260 | 30.03.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE8127522 | 19.09.1981 | DE8203188 | 06.02.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4603951 | 05.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE8127522 | 19.09.1981 | DE8203188 | 06.02.1982 |