EP0075794 - Method of simulating a flux signal for an induction machine and circuit arrangement for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1986 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1986 [1986/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinle, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Moorbachweg 14 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1983/14] | Application number, filing date | 82108560.2 | 16.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | DE19813138557 | 28.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3138557 | [1983/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075794 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075794 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/62, G01R31/34 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
G01R31/343 (EP,US);
H02P21/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Nachbildung des Maschinenflusses einer Drehfeldmaschine und Schaltungsanordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1983/14] | English: | Method of simulating a flux signal for an induction machine and circuit arrangement for carrying out this method | [1983/14] | French: | Méthode pour simuler le flux d'une machine à champ tournant et circuit d'arrangement pour réaliser la méthode | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 19.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1806769 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2180998 (FORSSELL HARRY [SE]); | [AD]EP0007552 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4245181 (PLUNKETT ALLAN B) | Examination | - REGELUNGSTECHNIK, Band 27, Nr. 12, Dezember 1979, München (DE) R. GABRIEL et al.: "Regelung der stromrichtergespeisten Drehstrom-Asynchronmaschine mit einem Mikrorechner", Seite 379 bis 386 |