EP0075293 - Method for inhibiting beta-D-galactosidase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1987 [1987/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 5-8, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | For all designated states FUJIREBIO KABUSHIKI KAISHA also trading as FUJIREBIO INC. 6-7, Shimoochiai 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | For all designated states AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 5-8, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
For all designated states FUJIREBIO KABUSHIKI KAISHA also trading as FUJIREBIO INC. 6-7, Shimoochiai 4-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takenouchi, Tomoharu No. 2-15-3, Nakamachi Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kamimura, Akira No. 2-25-19, Ikego Zushi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1983/13] | Representative(s) | Schübel-Hopf, Ursula, et al Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 22 14 55 80504 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | Schübel-Hopf, Ursula, et al Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 22 14 55 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108604.8 | 17.09.1982 | [1983/13] | Priority number, date | JP19810146394 | 18.09.1981 Original published format: JP 14639481 | [1983/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0075293 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0075293 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075293 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/99, C12Q1/34, // C12N9/38 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
C12N9/99 (EP);
C12Q1/34 (EP);
G01N2333/924 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/13] | C12N9/99, C12Q1/54, // C12N9/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1983/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Hemmung von beta-D-Galaktosidase | [1983/13] | English: | Method for inhibiting beta-D-galactosidase | [1983/13] | French: | Méthode pour inhiber la bêta-D-galactosidase | [1983/13] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 20.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 30.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP5710453 ; | [E]GB2102946 | [X] - STEROIDS, vol. 37, no. 3, March 1981, pages 303-314, San Francisco, California, USA | [X] - R.J. MAYER, J.H. WALKER: "Immunochemical methods in the biological sciences: enzymes and proteins" 1980, Academic Press, New York, USA | [XP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 70, 6th May 1982, page 948 P 113 & JP - A - 57 10453 (TOYO JOZO K.K.) 20-01-1982, & JP5710453 A 00000000 | [Y] - H.R. MAHLER & EUGENE H. CORDES: "Biological chemistry", 1966, Harper International, New York, USA | [Y] - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 18, no. 19, 1979, pages 4090-4095, Easton, Pa., USA | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol.79, no.11, 17th September 1973, page 184, no. 63185r, Columbus, Ohio, USA | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 73, no. 11, 14th September 1970, page 27, no. 52487r, Columbus, Ohio, USA | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no 25, 17th December 1979, page 492, no. 209054u, Columbus, Ohio, USA | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 79, no. 11, 17th September 1973, page 184, no. 63185r, Columbus, Ohio, USA G.S. CASE et al.: "Role of magnesium ions in beta-galactosidase-catalyzed hydrolyses. Charge and shape of the beta-galactopyranosyl binding site" |