EP0075807 - Elastic bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1987 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jörn, Frieda Porschestrasse 10 D-7012 Fellbach / DE | [1984/34] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states Jörn, Raoul, Dipl.-Ing. D-8992 Hengnau Nr. 53 1/7 Post Wasserburg a.B. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jörn, Raoul (verstorben) D-8992 Hengnau / DE | [1986/49] |
Former [1984/36] | 01 /
Jörn, Raoul (verstorben) | ||
Former [1983/14] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Neubauer, Hans-Jürgen Neubauer - Liebl Patentanwälte Fauststrasse 30 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | Neubauer, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Fauststrasse 30 D-85051 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108613.9 | 17.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | DE19813137343 | 19.09.1981 Original published format: DE 3137343 | [1983/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0075807 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0075807 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075807 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60K5/12, F16F1/38, F16F15/08 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
F16F1/387 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1983/14] | B60K5/12, F16F1/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/14] | Title | German: | Elastisches Lager | [1983/14] | English: | Elastic bearing | [1983/14] | French: | Support élastique | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 23.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2267172 (CURT SAURER); | [A]AT317696B (RAOUL JOERN DIPL ING [DE]); | [Y]AT338631B (JOERN RAOUL DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]DD137467 (WEISSFLOG SIEGHARD); | [A]DE2816742 (JOERN GMBH); | [YD]DE2915811 (JOERN GMBH); | [X]EP0025459 (JORN FRIEDA [DE]) |