EP0075873 - Protective relay system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.08.1989 [1989/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andow, Fumio 1-34-6, Mejirodai Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamaura, Mitsuru 2-13-4, Mejirodai Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kondow, Ryotaro 1-11-4, Miyasaka Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/14] | Patentanwälte Henkel, Pfenning, Feiler, Hänzel & Meinig Möhlstrasse 37 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108813.5 | 23.09.1982 | [1983/14] | Priority number, date | JP19810153567 | 30.09.1981 Original published format: JP 15356781 | [1983/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075873 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075873 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/38, H02H7/26, G06F15/56 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
H02H3/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1983/14] | Title | German: | Schutzrelaissystem | [1983/14] | English: | Protective relay system | [1983/14] | French: | Système de relais de protection | [1983/14] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 26.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0040471 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | GB2008345 [ ] (MULTILIN INC); | DE1169018 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) | Examination | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE I.E.E.E., vol. 126, no. 11, November 1979, New York, M.T. SANT et al. "Online digital fault locator for overhead transmission line", pages 1181 to 1185 |