|
11.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.04.1991 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1991 |
F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.01.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.08.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.03.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1990 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1989 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.1989 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1989 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.03.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.03.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.03.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.01.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1988 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1988 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.10.1988 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.06.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.06.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.10.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.09.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.08.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1986 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.08.1986 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
26.05.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1986 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.09.1985 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.08.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.1985 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.08.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.1984 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.1984 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.1984 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
07.05.1984 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.1983 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1983 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1983 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1983 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1982 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.11.1982 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
14.10.1982 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.1982 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
24.09.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1982 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |