EP0076442 - A hollow fiber of cuprammonium regenerated cellulose and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.09.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | For all designated states Asahi Medical Co., Ltd. 1-2 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | ||
For all designated states Asahi Medical Co., Ltd. 1-2 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokogi, Masanobu 722-16 Ooaza-Ozue Kadogawa-machi Higashiusuki-gun Miyazaki-ken / JP | 02 /
Sugimoto, Yoshifumi Tsurugaokakita-7-jo 1971-52 Hirabaru-machi Nobeoka-shi Miyazaki-ken / JP | 03 /
Ono, Yotsuo 1751-5 Shiohama-machi 3-chome Nobeoka-shi Miyazaki-ken / JP | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108839.0 | 24.09.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | JP19810154808 | 01.10.1981 Original published format: JP 15480881 | [1983/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076442 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076442 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0076442 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/24, B01D69/08 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
D01F2/04 (KR);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/082 (EP,US);
B01D69/0871 (EP,KR,US);
B01D71/12 (EP,US);
D01D5/16 (KR);
D01D5/24 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2975 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1983/15] | D01D5/24, B01D13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/15] | Title | German: | Hohlfaser aus regenerierter Kupfer-Ammonium-Zellulose und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1983/15] | English: | A hollow fiber of cuprammonium regenerated cellulose and process for producing the same | [1983/15] | French: | Filament creux en cuprammonium de cellulose régénérée et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1983/15] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/15] | 23.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.1985
17.01.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Faser AG Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.1985
17.01.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Faser AG Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1985/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.08.1985
Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | 20.01.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.07.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.08.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 29.06.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.07.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.08.1989 | Appeal received No. T0535/89 | 14.03.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1984 | BE | 27.12.1984 | CH | 27.12.1984 | LI | 27.12.1984 | NL | 27.12.1984 | SE | 27.12.1984 | LU | 30.09.1985 | GB | 21.11.1988 | FR | 30.09.1989 | [2007/32] |
Former [2000/03] | AT | 27.12.1984 | |
BE | 27.12.1984 | ||
CH | 27.12.1984 | ||
LI | 27.12.1984 | ||
NL | 27.12.1984 | ||
SE | 27.12.1984 | ||
LU | 30.09.1985 | ||
GB | 21.11.1988 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 27.12.1984 | |
BE | 27.12.1984 | ||
CH | 27.12.1984 | ||
LI | 27.12.1984 | ||
NL | 27.12.1984 | ||
SE | 27.12.1984 | ||
LU | 30.09.1985 | ||
GB | 24.09.1986 | ||
Former [1989/28] | AT | 27.12.1984 | |
BE | 27.12.1984 | ||
CH | 27.12.1984 | ||
LI | 27.12.1984 | ||
NL | 27.12.1984 | ||
SE | 27.12.1984 | ||
GB | 24.09.1986 | ||
Former [1989/19] | AT | 27.12.1984 | |
BE | 27.12.1984 | ||
CH | 27.12.1984 | ||
LI | 27.12.1984 | ||
NL | 27.12.1984 | ||
SE | 27.12.1984 | ||
Former [1989/17] | AT | 27.12.1984 | |
BE | 27.12.1984 | ||
CH | 27.12.1984 | ||
LI | 27.12.1984 | ||
NL | 27.12.1984 | ||
Former [1986/23] | AT | 27.12.1984 | |
BE | 27.12.1984 | ||
NL | 27.12.1984 | ||
Former [1986/15] | BE | 27.12.1984 | |
NL | 27.12.1984 | ||
Former [1986/11] | BE | 27.12.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP5455623 ; | [AD]JP5386834 ; | [A]DE2328853 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]FR2444486 (AKZO NV [NL]) |