EP0077473 - Method for producing one-side zinc hot dipped steel sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/17] | System for producing one-side zinc hot dipped steel sheets | ||
[1985/20] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.07.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1988 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 14.09.1988 [1988/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-Chome Kitahonmachi-Dori Chuo-Ku, Kobe-City Hyogo 651 / JP | [1985/33] |
Former [1983/17] | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-chome Kitahonmachi-dori Fukiai-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwanuma, Katsuhiko 6-1-2, Omiyadai Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Yoshihara, Takahisa 3-12, Nitona-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Shijima, Syoji 4-8-5, Chishirodaiminami Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Akiyoshi, Katsunori 1826-38, Haniya Sanbu-machi Sanbu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 05 /
Fujita, Yoshinori 2-20-6, Minami-cho Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 06 /
Nemoto, Hiroshi 4-23-1, Suehiro Chiba-shi Chiba-ken / JP | [1983/17] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/17] | Patentanwälte Henkel, Pfenning, Feiler, Hänzel & Meinig Möhlstrasse 37 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108861.4 | 24.09.1982 | [1983/17] | Priority number, date | JP19810165508 | 16.10.1981 Original published format: JP 16550881 | [1983/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077473 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077473 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0077473 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/02, C23C2/30, C23C2/06 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
C23C2/00344 (EP,US);
C23C2/024 (EP,US);
C23C2/0038 (EP,US);
C23C2/0224 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/17] | C23C1/14, C23C1/12, C23C1/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von einseitig feuerverzinkten Stahlblechen | [1985/20] | English: | Method for producing one-side zinc hot dipped steel sheets | [1985/20] | French: | Procédé pour la production de tôles d'acier par zingage à chaud d'une seule face | [1985/20] |
Former [1983/17] | Anordnung zur Herstellung von einseitig feuerverzinkten Stahlblechen | ||
Former [1983/17] | System for producing one-side zinc hot dipped steel sheets | ||
Former [1983/17] | Système pour la production de tôles d'acier par zingage à chaud d'une seule face | Examination procedure | 14.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/17] | 29.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.02.1986
Hoesch AG Eberhardstrasse 12 Postfach 16 00 D-4600 Dortmund 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.02.1986
Hoesch AG Eberhardstrasse 12 Postfach 16 00 D-4600 Dortmund 1 / DE | 26.02.1986 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 07.03.1986 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 18.03.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.07.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.07.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.04.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.1987 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.06.1988 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4177303 (CLIPSTON ROBERT H [CA], et al); | [Y]US4285995 (GOMERSALL DAVID W) |