EP0077926 - Process to suppress surface deposits during salt bath nitriding of structural parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/18] | Salt bath for nitriding iron workpieces | ||
[1985/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.1986 [1986/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Johannes, Dr. Reichsforststrasse 8 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Kunst, Helmut, Dr. Nordring 42 D-6458 Rodenbach I / DE | 03 /
Scondo, Christian Grünaustrasse 9 D-6454 Grossauheim / DE | [1983/18] | Application number, filing date | 82108892.9 | 25.09.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | DE19813142318 | 24.10.1981 Original published format: DE 3142318 | [1983/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077926 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077926 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/50 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
C23C8/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/18] | C23C9/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Unterdrücken on Oberflächenbelägen beim Salzbadnitrieren von Bauteilen | [1985/49] | English: | Process to suppress surface deposits during salt bath nitriding of structural parts | [1985/49] | French: | Procédé à supprimer des couches sur la surface de pièces finales pendant la nitruration dans un bain de sel | [1985/49] |
Former [1983/18] | Salzbad zum Nitrieren von Eisenwerkstoffen | ||
Former [1983/18] | Salt bath for nitriding iron workpieces | ||
Former [1983/18] | Bain de sel pour la nitruration d'articles en fer | Examination procedure | 25.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/18] | 05.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH359339 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [Y]DE1237872 (DEGUSSA) |