EP0086871 - Respiratory apparatus with protective hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.1986 [1986/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drägerwerk Aktiengesellschaft 23542 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | For all designated states Drägerwerk Aktiengesellschaft D-23542 Lübeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walther, Hans-Joachim, Ing. grad. Karpfenstrasse 12 D-2400 Lübeck / DE | [1983/35] | Application number, filing date | 82108962.0 | 28.09.1982 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | DE19823206484 | 23.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3206484 | [1983/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0086871 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0086871 | Date: | 14.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0086871 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/04 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
A62B17/04 (EP,US);
A62B23/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1983/35] | Title | German: | Atemschutzgerät mit Schutzhaube | [1983/35] | English: | Respiratory apparatus with protective hood | [1983/35] | French: | Appareil respiratoire avec bonnet de protection | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/10] | 13.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1063464 ; | [A]DE948939 (AUERGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [AD]DE8015449U ; | [AP]DE8204996U |