EP0079453 - Ultrasonic pulse Doppler apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.1986 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1987 [1987/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hongo, Hironobu Toshiba-nozaki-ryo 1376-1, Shimoishigami Ootawara-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | [1983/21] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/21] | Patentanwälte Henkel, Pfenning, Feiler, Hänzel & Meinig Möhlstrasse 37 D-8000 München 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109070.1 | 30.09.1982 | [1983/21] | Priority number, date | JP19810180382 | 12.11.1981 Original published format: JP 18038281 | [1983/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079453 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079453 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, G01S15/00 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
G01S15/8979 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/21] | Title | German: | Ultraschallimpuls-Doppler-Gerät | [1983/21] | English: | Ultrasonic pulse Doppler apparatus | [1983/21] | French: | Appareil d'impulsion ultrasonore Doppler | [1983/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/21] | 07.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AU490105B [ ]; | GB1404783 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | US4141347 [ ] (GREEN PHILIP S, et al); | EP0010304 [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | US4217909 [ ] (ENGELER WILLIAM E [US], et al) |