EP0076484 - Incinerator and method of consuming by combustion, especially of vegetable waste such as hulls or husks of grains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1986 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMUNAUTE EUROPEENNE DE L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE (EURATOM) Bâtiment Jean Monnet Plateau du Kirchberg Boîte Postale 1907 L-1019 Luxembourg / LU | [1983/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnaure, Pierre via Milano 1 I-21027 Ispra Varese / IT | 02 /
Bulhon, Jean Domaine Fromenteaux F-63190 Lezoux / FR | 03 /
Guillot, Jack 19, rue Voltaire F-91760 Juvisy sur Orge / FR | [1983/15] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | Weinmiller, Jürgen Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109079.2 | 01.10.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | FR19810019120 | 02.10.1981 Original published format: FR 8119120 | [1983/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076484 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076484 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/00 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
F23G5/027 (EP);
C10B53/02 (EP);
F23G5/46 (EP);
F23G2202/101 (EP);
F23G2206/203 (EP);
Y02E20/12 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1983/15] | Title | German: | Verbrennungsvorrichtung und -verfahren, insbesondere für pflanzliche Abfälle, wie Körnerschalen oder -hüllen | [1983/15] | English: | Incinerator and method of consuming by combustion, especially of vegetable waste such as hulls or husks of grains | [1983/15] | French: | Installation de pyrolyse, notamment pour des déchets végétaux tels que des coques ou des enveloppes de graines, et procédé de fonctionnement | [1983/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 29.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE966644 (BASF AG); | [Y]DE1128588 (GERHARD MOELLER); | [A]FR2295369 (GUIDAS [FR]); | [A]DE658718 (RHEINMETALL BORSIG AG, et al); | [A]GB1019613 (JOHN LAWRENCE MARGETTS); | [A]FR2271518 (LUMMUS CO [US]) |