EP0079457 - Pipe coupling and its utilization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1985 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Straub, Immanuel CH-7323 Wangs / CH | [1983/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/21] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 82109218.6 | 06.10.1982 | [1983/21] | Priority number, date | CH19810007076 | 05.11.1981 Original published format: CH 707681 | [1983/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079457 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/06, F16L55/16 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
F16L17/04 (EP);
F16L55/172 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/21] | Title | German: | Rohrkupplung sowie Verwendung derselben | [1983/21] | English: | Pipe coupling and its utilization | [1983/21] | French: | Raccord de tuyaux et son utilisation | [1983/21] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 12.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 17.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB995409 (CORNING GLASS WORKS); | [A]US2403449 (GERHARD MEYER, et al); | [A]US2893097 (HILL JOSEPH F, et al); | [A]US2897569 (KASTNER DONALD E); | [A]DE6932291U (ERICH SCHLEMPER FA [DE]); | [A]US2417741 (DILLON STEPHEN V); | [A]FR587221 ; | [AD]DE2428101 (STRAUB IMMANUEL) |