EP0077059 - Polyphenylene ether resin compositions for EMI electromagnetic interference shielding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.1989 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1983/16] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abolins, Visvaldis 15 Haddington Lane Delmar New York 12054 / US | 02 /
Caraher, Joel Matthew General Electric Comp. P.O.B. 8 Bldg. K1, R. 1532 Schenectady N.Y. 12301 / US | 03 /
Bopp, Richard Charles 6 Wyndon Road Ballston Lake Schenectady New York 12019 / US | 04 /
Lovgren, Eric Magnus R.D. No.1 Box 74 Westerlo New York 12193 / US | [1983/47] |
Former [1983/46] | 01 /
Abolins, Visvaldis 15 Haddington Lane Delmar New York 12054 / US | ||
02 /
Caraher, Joel Matthew Box 97, Florida Road Bldg. K1, R. 1532 Schenectady N.Y. 12301 / US | |||
03 /
Bopp, Richard Charles 6 Wyndon Road Ballston Lake Schenectady New York 12019 / US | |||
04 /
Lovgren, Eric Magnus R.D. No.1 Box 74 Westerlo New York 12193 / US | |||
Former [1983/17] | 01 /
Abolins, Visvaldis 15 Haddington Lane Delmar New York 12054 / US | ||
02 /
Caraher, Joel Matthew Box 97, Florida Road Schenectady New York 12309 / US | |||
03 /
Bopp, Richard Charles 6 Wyndon Road Ballston Lake Schenectady New York 12019 / US | |||
04 /
Lovgren, Eric Magnus R.D. No.1 Box 74 Westerlo New York 12193 / US | |||
Former [1983/16] | 01 /
Abolins, Visvaldis 15 Haddington Lane Delmar New York 12054 / US | ||
02 /
Caraher, Joel Matthew 2150 Rosa Road Apt. B-12-A Schenectady New York 12309 / US | |||
03 /
Bopp, Richard Charles 6 Wyndon Road Ballston Lake Schenectady New York 12019 / US | |||
04 /
Lovgren, Eric Magnus R.D. No.1 Box 74 Westerlo New York 12193 / US | Representative(s) | Schüler, Horst, et al Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/16] | Schüler, Horst, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109368.9 | 09.10.1982 | [1983/16] | Priority number, date | US19810311268 | 14.10.1981 Original published format: US 311268 | [1983/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0077059 | Date: | 20.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0077059 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0077059 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/04, C08L25/06, C08K3/04, C08K3/08, C08K7/02, H05K9/00 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
H05K9/0083 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,US);
C08L71/123 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
H01B1/24 (EP,US);
H05K9/009 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/123, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/16] | C08L71/04, C08L25/06, C08K3/08, C08K7/02, H05K9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/16] | Title | German: | Polyphenylenäther-Harzmassen zur Abschirmung von elektromagnetischer Störstrahlung | [1983/16] | English: | Polyphenylene ether resin compositions for EMI electromagnetic interference shielding | [1983/16] | French: | Compositions de résine éther de polyphénylène pour le blindage de rayonnement perturbateur électro-magnétique | [1983/16] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/47] | 13.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3383435 (CIZEK ERIC P); | [Y]US3745140 (SEGAL L); | [Y]FR2393016 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]); | [Y]FR2233367 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y]DE2460482 (IBM); | [Y]DE3008264 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) | Examination | - Electrical Engineer's Handbook Electric Power, Ed. Pender and Del Mar, Wiley, 1949, p. 14-201 |