EP0081653 - Method of recording and reading optimum density bar code [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krieg, Michael LeRoy 316 Taylor Drive Lexington, KY 40505 / US | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Siccardi, Louis Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Siccardi, Louis Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 82109513.0 | 14.10.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | US19810325894 | 30.11.1981 Original published format: US 325894 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081653 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081653 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081653 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/14, G06K1/12, G06K7/016 | [1986/03] | CPC: |
G06K1/121 (EP,US);
G06K7/0166 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/25] | G06K7/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufzeichnen und Ablesen von Strichkoden optimaler Dichte | [1983/25] | English: | Method of recording and reading optimum density bar code | [1983/25] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement et de lecture de codes à barres de densité optimale | [1983/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 30.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2181409 (ANKER WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]US4044227 (HOLM JAMES P, et al); | [A]DE2648871 (STEINHILBER HELMUT); | [A]DE2935801 (WERNER GERHARD); | [APD]EP0050198 (IBM [US]) |