EP0085752 - Printing unit for a rotary offset machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1987 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [1983/33] | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Hermann Pferseer Strasse 15 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1983/33] | Application number, filing date | 82109663.3 | 20.10.1982 | [1983/33] | Priority number, date | DE19823203948 | 05.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3203948 | [1983/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085752 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085752 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/10 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
B41F7/10 (EP,US);
B41P2217/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/33] | Title | German: | Druckwerk für eine Offsetrotationsdruckmaschine | [1983/33] | English: | Printing unit for a rotary offset machine | [1983/33] | French: | Groupe imprimant pour rotative offset | [1983/33] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/35] | 16.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE116209 ; | [A]DE1561068 (KOENIG & BAUER SCHNELLPRESSFAB); | [A]DE2339323 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [A]GB2025325 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG) |