EP0081658 - Vehicle steering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. 23555 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states TRW INC. 23555 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dymond, Richard Warren 2105 Avoncrest Drive Rochester Michigan 48063 / US | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Prinz, Leiser, Bunke & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-8000 München 60 / DE | ||
Former [1983/25] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109689.8 | 20.10.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | US19810329219 | 10.12.1981 Original published format: US 329219 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081658 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081658 | Date: | 30.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/06, B62D5/08 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
B62D6/02 (EP,US);
B62D5/08 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87153 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | Lenkeinrichtung für Fahrzeug | [1983/25] | English: | Vehicle steering apparatus | [1983/25] | French: | Appareil de direction pour véhicule | [1983/25] | File destroyed: | 15.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 13.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 17.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/44] | 03.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2791287 (STOLTE RICHARD C); | [A]FR1178653 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]DE2240946 (AISIN SEIKI); | [AD]US3744515 (INOUE N); | [A]US3833081 (SUZUKI A); | [A]US3877540 (MASUDA NAOSUKE, et al); | [AD]US3902320 (MARIETTA WALTER E); | [AD]FR2281260 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]US4119172 (YANAGISHIMA TAKAYUKI, et al); | [A]FR2442753 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [A]FR2448677 (ROULEMENTS SOC NOUVELLE) |