Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3263427D1 | 05.06.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3143870 | 05.11.1981 | DE3263427 | 22.10.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0078950 | Global Dossier | 02.05.1985 | B1 | EP0078950 | 07.09.1983 | A3 | EP0078950 | 18.05.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3143870 | 05.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3143870 | 11.05.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3143870 | 05.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0323490B | 29.03.1991 | B2 | JPS5884127 | 20.05.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3143870 | 05.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4448761 | 15.05.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3143870 | 05.11.1981 |