EP0078950 - Process for the preparation of acicular, ferrimagnetic iron oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarnecki, Wilhelm, Dr. Woogstrasse 48 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
Kovacs, Jenoe, Dr. Robert-Koch-Strasse 18 D-6712 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 03 /
Loeser, Werner, Dr. Klagenfurter Strasse 16 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
Rudolf, Peter, Dr. Wiesenstrasse 1 D-6708 Neuhofen / DE | 05 /
Vaeth, Guenter Woogstrasse 35 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | [1983/20] | Application number, filing date | 82109746.6 | 22.10.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | DE19813143870 | 05.11.1981 Original published format: DE 3143870 | [1983/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0078950 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0078950 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078950 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/02, H01F1/11 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
G11B5/70694 (EP,US);
C01G49/06 (EP,US);
C01G49/08 (EP,US);
C01P2004/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von nadelförmigen, ferrimagnetischen Eisenoxiden | [1983/20] | English: | Process for the preparation of acicular, ferrimagnetic iron oxides | [1983/20] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'oxydes de fer aciculaire, ferrimagnetique | [1983/20] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/20] | 11.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0014302 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0024693 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]FR2369214 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US4176172 (BENNETCH LEONARD M [US], et al); | [AD]DE2064804 (HI CRYSTAL CO LTD) |