EP0078953 - Push button for an electric switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1986 [1986/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borter, Ephraim Buchfeldstrasse 17 CH-6033 Buchrain / CH | [1983/20] | Application number, filing date | 82109757.3 | 22.10.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | CH19810007103 | 06.11.1981 Original published format: CH 710381 | [1983/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078953 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078953 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/12 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
H01H3/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/20] | Title | German: | Vorsatzdruckknopf für elektrische Schalter | [1983/20] | English: | Push button for an electric switch | [1983/20] | French: | Bouton poussoir pour interrupteur électrique | [1983/20] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/45] | 22.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1369220 (JUNKERS & CO); | [X]FR1419830 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE); | [A]GB1048795 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [X]US3663780 (GOLBECK BERNARD J) |