EP0078031 - Pressure accumulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/18] | Cylinder-piston arrangement, used in particular as a pressure accumulator | ||
[1986/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1987 [1987/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gage, Douglas Millard 5633 Constance Court Dubuque Iowa 52001 / US | [1983/18] | Representative(s) | Fricke, Joachim Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/18] | Fricke, Joachim, Dr. Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109758.1 | 22.10.1982 | [1983/18] | Priority number, date | US19810314812 | 26.10.1981 Original published format: US 314812 | [1983/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078031 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078031 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/053 | [1983/18] | CPC: |
F15B1/24 (EP);
F15B2201/205 (EP);
F15B2201/312 (EP);
F15B2201/32 (EP);
F15B2201/41 (EP);
F15B2201/4155 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1983/18] | Title | German: | Druckakkumulator | [1986/28] | English: | Pressure accumulator | [1986/28] | French: | Accumulateur de pression | [1986/28] |
Former [1983/18] | Zylinder-Kolben-Anordnung, insb. zum Einsatz als Druckakkumulator | ||
Former [1983/18] | Cylinder-piston arrangement, used in particular as a pressure accumulator | ||
Former [1983/18] | Ensemble cylindre-piston, à utiliser en particulier comme accumulateur de pression | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/02] | 20.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH591020 ; | [X]GB956572 ; | [A]DE1450347 ; | [A]US2754847 ; | [A]US2683467 | Examination | US4186777 |