EP0078492 - Method of controlling storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nozawa, Masafumi 41, Kanou Minamiashigara-shi / JP | 02 /
Miyazaki, Michio 163-5, Nakazato Odawara-shi / JP | [1983/19] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/19] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109893.6 | 26.10.1982 | [1983/19] | Priority number, date | JP19810173860 | 30.10.1981 Original published format: JP 17386081 | [1983/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0078492 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0078492 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078492 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B27/36 | [1983/19] | CPC: |
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B7/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Speichervorrichtung | [1983/19] | English: | Method of controlling storage device | [1983/19] | French: | Procédé pour commander un dispositif de mémoire | [1983/19] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 13.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3365706 (KING GILBERT W); | [A]US4145758 (DREXLER JEROME, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 4, September 1978, page 1646, New York (USA); K.G. BEAMAN: "Method of defective block flagging and alternative block assignment of fixed block formatted data recorded on the tracks of a DASD-based storage subsystem" | [A] - IEEE SPECTRUM, vol. 16, no. 2, February 1979, pages 33-38, New York (USA); G.C. KENNEY et al.: "An optical disk replaces 25 mag tapes" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 18, no. 5, October 1975, page 1577, New York (USA);N.K. OUCHI: "Tape defect bypass mechanism" |