Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] |
18.01.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.03.1986 [1986/10] |
04.08.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.10.1983 [1983/40] |
29.03.1983 | Change - inventor | published on 01.06.1983 [1983/22] |
29.03.1983 | Change - inventor | published on 01.06.1983 [1983/22] |
19.03.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.05.1983 [1983/20] |