Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0078978 | Global Dossier | 05.03.1986 | B1 | EP0078978 | 18.05.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP16114381 | 30.10.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3269682D1 | 10.04.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP16114381 | 30.10.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6218601Y | 13.05.1987 | Y2 | JPS5867845U | 09.05.1983 | U | Priority number | Date | JP16114381 | 30.10.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4458850 | 10.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP16114381 | 30.10.1981 |