blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0079022

EP0079022 - Derivatives of cis, endo-2-azabicyclo-(3.3.0)-octane-3-carboxylic acid, process for their preparation, medicines containing them and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  24.06.1993
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/20]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Teetz, Volker, Dr.
An der Tann 20
D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE
02 / Geiger, Rolf, Prof. Dr.
Heinrich-Bleicher-Strasse 33
D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE
03 / Urbach, Hansjörg, Dr.
Le Lavandou Strasse 41
D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE
04 / Becker, Reinhard, Dr.
Adelheidstrasse 101
D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE
05 / Schölkens, Bernward, Dr.
Am Fliedergarten 1
D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE
[1983/20]
Application number, filing date82110070.802.11.1982
[1983/20]
Priority number, dateDE1981314394605.11.1981         Original published format: DE 3143946
DE1982322676817.07.1982         Original published format: DE 3226768
[1983/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0079022
Date:18.05.1983
Language:DE
[1983/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0079022
Date:05.10.1983
Language:DE
[1983/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0079022
Date:12.03.1986
Language:DE
[1986/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.1983
ClassificationIPC:C07D209/52, C07C101/28, C07C101/34, A61K31/40
[1983/20]
CPC:
C07K5/0222 (EP,US); C07D209/52 (EP,KR,US); A61P9/12 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1983/20]
TitleGerman:Derivate der cis, endo-2-Azabicyclo-(3.3.0)-octan-3-carbonsäure, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, diese enthaltende Mittel und deren Verwendung[1983/20]
English:Derivatives of cis, endo-2-azabicyclo-(3.3.0)-octane-3-carboxylic acid, process for their preparation, medicines containing them and their use[1983/20]
French:Dérivés de l'acide cis, endo-2-azabicyclo-(3.3.0)-octane-3-carboxylique, procédé pour leur préparation, medicaments les contenant et leur application[1983/20]
Examination procedure23.02.1984Examination requested  [1984/18]
11.01.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.03.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
12.09.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.1985Fee for grant paid
07.12.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP84111056.2  / EP0150263
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.12.1986  20.01.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Knappwost, Adolf, Professor Dr.
Am Pfarrgarten 3
D-31061 Alfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1987/06]
Opponent(s)01  10.12.1986  20.01.1987  ADMISSIBLE
Knappwost, Adolf, Professor Dr.
Am Pfarrgarten 3
D-31061 Alfeld / DE
Opponent's representative
TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
22.01.1987Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.1987Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.07.1987Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
21.12.1987Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
07.02.1991Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
10.03.1993Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/32]
Appeal following opposition05.04.1991Appeal received No.  T0289/91
24.05.1991Statement of grounds filed
25.06.1993Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
10.03.1993Date of oral proceedings
16.03.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP52039020B  ;
 [A]JP52116485  ;
 [A]DE1955375  (BASF AG);
 [AD]EP0037231  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US])
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 69, Nr.9, 26. August 1968, Seite 3337, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung Nr. 35847h COLUMBUS OHIO (US) & Tetrahedron Letters, Nr. 11, 1968 Seiten 1317-1319; S. HAUPTMANN et al.: "New synthesis of substituted thiophenes and pyrroles"
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 89, Nr. 25, 18. Dezember 1978, Seite 630, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung Nr. 215732p COLUMBUS OHIO (US) & Arm. Khim. Zh. 1978, Vol. 34, Nr. 4, pages 273-275; S.G. AGBALYAN et al.: "Addition of aliphatic amino acids to beta-aroyl acrylic acids"
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 88, Nr.5, 30. Januar 1978, Seite 470, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung Nr.37442p COLUMBUS OHIO (US) & JP - B - 52 039 020 (MORIKAWA, YUKIAKI et al.) (03-10-1977), & JP52039020B B 00000000
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 89, Nr.15, 9. Oktober 1978, Seite 595, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassung Nr. 129529w COLUMBUS OHIO (US) & JP - A - 52 116 485 (CHEMIE LINZ A.-G)(29-09-1977), & JP52116485 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.