EP0108156 - Improved method for the preparation of non-crystalline polymers of high molecular weight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 600 North Dairy Ashford Houston, TX 77079 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states Conoco Inc. 1000 South Pine Street P.O. Box 1267 Ponca City Oklahoma 74603 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mack, Mark Phillip 301 W. Hartford -Apt. 311 Ponca City Oklahoma 74601 / US | 02 /
Wallace, Adrian L. Rt 13, Box 372 Lake Charles, LA 70601 / US | 03 /
Decker, Lewis B., Jr. No. 7, Ridge Drive Ponca City Oklahoma 74601 / US | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair, Schumann, Jakob, Bezold Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110099.7 | 02.11.1982 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108156 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108156 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/64 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
Y10S526/907 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0391 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/642 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/651 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von nicht kristallinen Polymeren mit hohem Molekulargewicht | [1984/20] | English: | Improved method for the preparation of non-crystalline polymers of high molecular weight | [1984/20] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de polymères non-cristallins de poids moléculaire élevé | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/05] | 15.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3116274 (HANS BOEHM, et al); | [Y]GB1017977 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO); | [Y]US3708465 (DIETRICH J, et al) |