EP0079058 - Reticulate electrode for recovery of metal ions and method for making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELTECH SYSTEMS CORPORATION Town Executive Center 6100 Glades Road Suite 305 Boca Raton Florida 33434 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states ELTECH SYSTEMS CORPORATION Town Executive Center 6100 Glades Road Suite 305 Boca Raton Florida 33434 / US | ||
Former [1983/20] | For all designated states DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORPORATION 717 North Harwood Street Dallas Texas 75201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Platek, Gary F. 2955 Hemlock Drive Willoughby Hills Ohio 44094 / US | 02 /
Krug, Geoffrey P. 7008 Brakeman Road Painesville Ohio 44077 / US | [1983/20] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al c/o DST SA 9, Route de Troinex CH-1227 Carouge/GE / CH | Application number, filing date | 82110180.5 | 04.11.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | US19810319480 | 09.11.1981 Original published format: US 319480 | [1983/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079058 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0079058 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/02 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
C25C7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/20] | Title | German: | Netzartige Elektrode für die Abscheidung von Metallionen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1983/20] | English: | Reticulate electrode for recovery of metal ions and method for making | [1983/20] | French: | Electrode réticulée pour la récupération d'ions métalliques et méthode pour sa fabrication | [1983/20] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 14.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.1987 | NL | 21.01.1987 | [1989/12] |
Former [1988/43] | NL | 21.01.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP7829126 ; | [Y]JP77127405 ; | [Y]JP77136803 ; | [Y]DE878107 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]FR1509002 (LORRAINE CARBONE); | [A]DE2225774 (RHONE POULENC SA); | [A]DE2255985 (R C E RICERCHE CONVERSIONE EN); | [Y]DE2363042 (IIJIMA RYOZO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4158612 (LUCH DANIEL, et al); | [Y]US4235696 (BERNSTEIN PHILIP [US], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 2, January 1979, page 502, no. 14051n, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 78 29 126 ((IIJIMA, RYOZO) (18-08-1978), & JP7829126 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 16, 17th April 1978, page 475, no. 112528b, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 77 127 405 (NIPPON KOBUNSHI KAGAKU K.K.) (26-10-1977), & JP77127405 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 18, 1st May 1978, page 469, no. 128273a, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 77 136 803 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) (15-11-1977), & JP77136803 A 00000000 |