EP0080106 - Process for preparing N-substituted N-isocyanatocarbonyl carbamates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1986 [1986/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühle, Engelbert, Dr. Von-Bodelschwingh-Strasse 42 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Hagemann, Hermann, Dr. Kandinsky-Strasse 52 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1983/22] | Application number, filing date | 82110322.3 | 09.11.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | DE19813146230 | 21.11.1981 Original published format: DE 3146230 | [1983/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0080106 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080106 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C125/06 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
C07C275/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-substituierten N-Isocyanatocarbonyl-carbamaten | [1983/22] | English: | Process for preparing N-substituted N-isocyanatocarbonyl carbamates | [1983/22] | French: | Procédé de préparation de N-isocyanatocarbonyl-carbamates N-substitués | [1983/22] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/22] | 18.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD] - SYNTHESIS, 1980, Seite 112, Georg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart, DE. |