EP0096730 - Gas-target method for the productions of iodine 123 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDION INTERNATIONAL, INC. P.O. Box 13500 447 March Road Kanata, Ontario, Canada K2K 1X8 / CA | For all designated states Stuart, Donald Craig 1077 Pinewood Crescent Ottawa / CA | [1990/04] |
Former [1986/33] | For all designated states ATOMIC ENERGY OF CANADA LIMITED P.O. Box 13500, 413 March Road Kanata Ontario, K1K 1X8 / CA | ||
For all designated states Stuart, Donald Craig 1077 Pinewood Crescent Ottawa / CA | |||
Former [1983/52] | For all designated states Robertson, Robert 1330 Harwood Street, Apt. 202 Vancouver British Columbia / CA | ||
For all designated states Stuart, Donald Craig 1077 Pinewood Crescent Ottawa / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robertson, Robert 1330 Harwood Street, Apt. 202 Vancouver, British Columbia / CA | 02 /
Stuart, Donald Craig 1077 Pinewood Crescent Ottawa / CA | [1987/11] |
Former [1986/33] | 01 /
Robertson, Robert 1330 Harwood Street, Apt. 202 Vancouver, British Columbia / CA | ||
02 /
Stuart, Donald Craig 1077 Pinewood Crescent | |||
Former [1983/52] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/52] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110386.8 | 11.11.1982 | [1983/52] | Priority number, date | CA19820404175 | 01.06.1982 Original published format: CA 404175 | [1983/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096730 | Date: | 28.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096730 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G21G1/10 | [1983/52] | CPC: |
G21G1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Jod 123 mit einem gasförmigen Target | [1983/52] | English: | Gas-target method for the productions of iodine 123 | [1983/52] | French: | Méthode à cible gazeuse pour la production d'iode 123 | [1983/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/36] | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.1987
22.06.1987
ADMISSIBLE Kernforschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02
08.12.1987
Cygne Cyclotrontoepassingen in de Geneeskunde Nederland B.V. Technische Universiteit Eindhoven Postbus 513 NL-5600 MB Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.1987
22.06.1987
ADMISSIBLE Kernforschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02
08.12.1987
Cygne Cyclotrontoepassingen in de Geneeskunde Nederland B.V. Technische Universiteit Eindhoven Postbus 513 NL-5600 MB Eindhoven / NL Opponent's representative Van kan, Johan Joseph Hubert, Ir. Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1987/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.1987
22.06.1987
ADMISSIBLE Kernforschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02.02.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.08.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.09.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 22.11.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.01.1992 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/21] | 23.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 20.09.1990 | Appeal received No. T0751/90 | 22.12.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.01.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.01.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.01.1992 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1992/33] | CH | 11.03.1987 | |
LI | 11.03.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3694313 (BLUE JAMES W, et al) | [X] - JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, vol. 12, no. 6, 1971, page 417 | [X] - INT. JOURNAL OF APPLIED RADIATIONS & ISOTOPES, vol. 33, Mars 1982, pages 183-187 | Examination | - JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, vol. 12, no. 6, 1971, page 417. "1231 production from spallation reactions" | - INT. JOURNAL OF APPLIED RADIATIONS & ISOTOPES, vol. 33, Mars 1982, pages 183-187. B. NORDELL et al.: "Production of 1231 by photonuclear reactions on xenon" | - International Journal of Applied Radiation and Isotopes. vol. 29, 1978, pages 261-267 |