EP0080131 - Solid ultrasonic delay line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO., LTD. 2-1-1 Odasakae, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1983/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoyama, Takeo 208-2 Imasato Ebina-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Imai, Ichiya 3-3-6 Riyousei Ayase-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Asaoko, Hideaki 3-12-15, Seishin Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/22] | Zipse + Habersack Kemnatenstrasse 49 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110464.3 | 12.11.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | JP19810188635 | 25.11.1981 Original published format: JP 18863581 | JP19820073836 | 30.04.1982 Original published format: JP 7383682 | JP19820073837 | 30.04.1982 Original published format: JP 7383782 | [1983/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080131 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080131 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080131 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/36 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
H03H9/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/22] | Title | German: | Festkörper Ultraschall-Verzögerungsleitung | [1983/22] | English: | Solid ultrasonic delay line | [1983/22] | French: | Ligne à retard solide à ultrasons | [1983/22] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 24.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3508174 (BACKERS FRANCISCUS THEODORUS, et al); | [AD]US3611200 (SLIEPENBEEK THEODORUS BARTHOLO, et al); | [AD]US3581247 (BELFORD JOHN F, et al) | [A] - GEC JOURNAL OF SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, vol. 41, nos. 2,3, 1974, pages 75-88, London, GB; D.G. KING et al.: "Bulk-wave ultrasonic delay lines for frequencies from 5MHz to 5GHz" | [AD] - IRE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS ENGINEERING, June 1960, pages 35-43, New York, USA; A.H. MEITZLER: "Ultrasonic delay lines using shear modes in strips" |