Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0080144 | Global Dossier | 05.03.1986 | B1 | EP0080144 | 01.06.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP18749581 | 20.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR230073 | 29.02.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP18749581 | 20.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1201627 | 11.03.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18749581 | 20.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3269701D1 | 10.04.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP18749581 | 20.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8402893 | 01.03.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP18749581 | 20.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6366937B | 22.12.1988 | B2 | JPS5891859 | 31.05.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18749581 | 20.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4451315 | 29.05.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | JP18749581 | 20.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA826020 | 27.07.1983 | B | Priority number | Date | JP18749581 | 20.11.1981 |