EP0079616 - Bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.1987 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1987 | Refusal of application | published on 25.03.1987 [1987/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Muth, Hans A. Schmiedweg 1 D-8031 Seefeld / DE | [1983/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/21] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110593.9 | 16.11.1982 | [1983/21] | Priority number, date | DE19813145634 | 17.11.1981 Original published format: DE 3145634 | [1983/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079616 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B62K19/00 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
B62K19/00 (EP);
B62K25/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/21] | Title | German: | Fahrrad | [1983/21] | English: | Bicycle | [1983/21] | French: | Bicyclette | [1983/21] | File destroyed: | 16.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 19.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.07.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 21.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/05] | 16.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/13] | 26.10.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/13] | Request for further processing for: | 26.08.1985 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.1985 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.1985 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3933373 ; | [A]FR2265602 ; | [A]US4230332 ; | [A]EP0006586 ; | [A]FR2451311 ; | [A]FR2337655 ; | [A]US4139072 |