EP0081114 - Method of firing a pulverized fuel-fired steam generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.06.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC. 1000 Prospect Hill Road Box 500 Windsor Connecticut 06095-0500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC. 1000 Prospect Hill Road Box 500 Windsor Connecticut 06095-0500 / US | ||
Former [1984/30] | For all designated states Lummus Crest S.à.r.l. Tour Franklin Cedex No.11 F-92081 Paris La Defense 8 / FR | ||
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states LUMMUS CREST S.A.R.L. Tour Franklin Cedex No.11 F-92081 Paris La Defense 8 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamilton, Thomas Berton 54 Crocus Lane Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1987/27] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Gross, Gernot K. Kleiberweg 5 D-65207 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1985/47] | Gross, Gernot K. Kleiberweg 5 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110650.7 | 18.11.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | US19810327844 | 07.12.1981 Original published format: US 327844 | [1983/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081114 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081114 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081114 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F23K3/02, F23K1/04, F23C9/00, F23L15/04, F23N1/02 | [1983/24] | CPC: |
F23N1/02 (EP,US);
F23C9/003 (EP,US);
F23K1/04 (EP,US);
F23K3/02 (EP,US);
F23L15/04 (EP,US);
F23N2221/12 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1983/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befeuern eines mit pulverförmigem Brennstoff beheizten Dampfkessels | [1983/24] | English: | Method of firing a pulverized fuel-fired steam generator | [1983/24] | French: | Procédé de combustion pour une chaudière à vapeur chauffée par un combustible pulvérisé | [1983/24] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/37] | 17.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.11.1986
07.01.1987
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Babcock Aktiengesellschaft Duisburger Strasse 375 D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | [1987/03] | 08.01.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.05.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.1988 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.03.1988 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3013390 (EVT ENERGIE & VERFAHRENSTECH [DE]); | [Y]US3519254 (PUTMAN RICHARD E); | [A]US4177950 (SMITH WILLIAM J [US]); | [A]US3043525 (GILBERT LYMAN F); | [A]FR1202239 (BABCOCK & WILCOX FRANCE); | [A]DE1253205 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]US2867182 (JOE CRITES) |