EP0085148 - Arrangement for error correction in position-measuring systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1989 [1989/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/32] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spies, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing. Wopfnerstrasse D-8221 Seebruck / DE | [1983/32] | Application number, filing date | 82110706.7 | 19.11.1982 | [1983/32] | Priority number, date | DE19823201005 | 15.01.1982 Original published format: DE 3201005 | [1983/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0085148 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0085148 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085148 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01D3/02 | [1983/32] | CPC: |
G01D5/24476 (EP,US);
G01D5/2448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/32] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Fehlerkorrektur bei Positionsmesssystemen | [1983/32] | English: | Arrangement for error correction in position-measuring systems | [1983/32] | French: | Dispositif pour la rectification des erreurs dans des systèmes de mesure de position | [1983/32] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/32] | 19.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1214892 ; | [Y]DE1138558 (CONTINENTAL ELEKTRO IND AG); | [X]DE1552273 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]DE1623905 (WENCZLER & HEIDENHAIN); | [A]GB2001786 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH); | [A]US4143267 (JOHNSON LONNIE G, et al); | [A]GB2034053 (SONY CORP); | [X]EP0039082 (TOKYO OPTICAL [JP]) |