Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.1987 [1987/05] |
13.12.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.02.1986 [1986/07] |
05.05.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.07.1983 [1983/27] |
05.05.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.07.1983 [1983/27] |