Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE17928T | 15.02.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | EP82110802 | 23.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU542725B | Global Dossier | 07.03.1985 | B2 | AU9166182 | 04.08.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0082956 | Global Dossier | 12.02.1986 | B1 | EP0082956 | 06.07.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1194709 | 08.10.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3269101D1 | 27.03.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK571382 | 25.06.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8400822 | 16.11.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS58118938 | 15.07.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6324424Y | 05.07.1988 | Y2 | JPS6244232U | 17.03.1987 | U | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO156844C | 02.12.1987 | C | NO156844B | 24.08.1987 | B | NO824361L | 27.06.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4491019 | 01.01.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | CH828481 | 24.12.1981 |