EP0082956 - Device for a contactless out-of-balance measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.1987 [1987/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONTRON-HOLDING AG Bernerstrasse Süd 169 CH-8048 Zürich / CH | [1983/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wicki, Gerhard Wartstrasse 1c CH-6331 Hünenberg / CH | 02 /
Näff, Rolf Albisstrasse 45 CH-6312 Steinhausen / CH | [1983/27] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/27] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110802.4 | 23.11.1982 | [1983/27] | Priority number, date | CH19810008284 | 24.12.1981 Original published format: CH 828481 | [1983/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082956 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082956 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B04B9/14 | [1983/27] | CPC: |
B04B9/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/27] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur berührungslosen Unwuchtmessung | [1983/27] | English: | Device for a contactless out-of-balance measurement | [1983/27] | French: | Dispositif de mesure sans contact direct du défaut d'équilibrage | [1983/27] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 16.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB641732 (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]FR1298343 (REACTOR CENTRUM NEDERLAND) |