EP0085761 - A positive resist composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1987 [1987/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clecak, Nicholas Jeffries 863 Hampswood Way San Jose California 95120 / US | 02 /
McKean, Dennis Richard 6780 Mason Way San Jose California 95129 / US | 03 /
Miller, Robert Dennis 6614 Tam O'Santer Drive San Jose California 95120 / US | 04 /
Tompkins, Terry Cady 11625 Por Avenue Los Altos California 94022 / US | 05 /
Twieg, Robert James 1027 Lincoln Court San Jose California 95125 / US | 06 /
Willson, Carlton Grant 896 Harding Avenue San Jose California 95126 / US | [1983/33] | Representative(s) | Hobbs, Francis John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Hobbs, Francis John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1983/33] | Chaudhry, Mohammad Saeed IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester Hants, S021 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 82110822.2 | 23.11.1982 | [1983/33] | Priority number, date | US19820347658 | 10.02.1982 Original published format: US 347658 | [1983/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085761 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085761 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/08 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
G03F7/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/33] | Title | German: | Positiv arbeitende Photoresistmasse | [1983/33] | English: | A positive resist composition | [1983/33] | French: | Composition photorésistante positive | [1983/33] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/08] | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed |