EP0081138 - Optical recording and reproducing disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.1988 [1988/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoh, Isao 12-22, Naritaminamimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Tomio 2-10-9, Myokenzaka Katano-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Ohara, Shunji 218, Shinjo, Higashiosaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Koishi, Kenji 3-4-38, Matsuodai, Inagawa-cho Kawabe-gun Hyogo-ken / JP | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110852.9 | 24.11.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | JP19810193970 | 01.12.1981 Original published format: JP 19397081 | JP19810196044 | 04.12.1981 Original published format: JP 19604481 | [1983/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081138 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081138 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081138 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B7/08 | [1983/24] | CPC: |
G11B7/24085 (EP,US);
G11B27/19 (EP,US);
G11B27/32 (EP,US);
G11B7/00745 (EP,US);
G11B7/08517 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/24] | Title | German: | Optische Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabescheibe | [1983/24] | English: | Optical recording and reproducing disc | [1983/24] | French: | Disque optique pour l'enregistrement et la reproduction | [1983/24] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 13.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55146675 ; | [A]JP56025278 ; | [X]US4094013 (HILL BERNHARD, et al); | [X]US4142209 (HEDLUND LEE V, et al); | [X]US3931457 (MES JOHANNES ANTONIUS MARIA); | [X]GB2036410 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]GB2045997 (PHILIPS NV); | [XP]EP0054438 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]EP0064196 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - NEUES AUS DER TECHNIK, no. 5, 15. Oktober 1979, pages 2, no. 542, Würzburg (DE); "Synchronization des Datenbitstromes bei Aufzeichnung auf einem scheibenfoermigen Aufzeichnungstraeger" | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 17(P-47)[689], 31st January 1981; & JP-A-55 146 675 (NIPPON COLUMBIA K.K.) (15-11-1981), & JP55146675 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 77(P-62)[749], 21st May 1981; & JP-A-56 025 278 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) (11-03-1981), & JP56025278 A 00000000 | Examination | - IEEE Spectrum, August 1979, pages 26 to 33 |