EP0081170 - High-temperature protective coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1987 [1987/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1987/37] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicoll, Andrew R. Fohlenweide 17 D-6836 Oftersheim / DE | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Kempe, Wolfgang, et al c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr., et al c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | ||
Former [1983/24] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82110979.0 | 27.11.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | DE19813148198 | 05.12.1981 Original published format: DE 3148198 | [1983/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081170 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081170 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081170 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C23C30/00, C22C19/05, F01D5/28 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
C22C19/058 (EP,US);
C23C4/073 (EP,US);
C23C4/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/24] | C23C17/00, C22C19/05, F01D5/28 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, NL [1983/24] | Title | German: | Hochtemperaturschutzschicht | [1983/24] | English: | High-temperature protective coating | [1983/24] | French: | Revêtement protecteur à haute température | [1983/24] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 10.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.01.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55125249 ; | [X]EP0035377 (WALL COLMONOY LTD); | [X]US2936229 (SHEPARD ARTHUR P); | [A]US4034142 (HECHT RALPH JULIUS); | [A]DE2816520 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]FR2321552 (FUTECTIC CORP [US]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 186(C-36)(668), 20. Dezember 1980, Seite 668C36 & JP - A - 55 125 249 (TAIHEI KINZOKU KOGYO K.K.) 26.09.1980, & JP55125249 A 00000000 |