EP0084631 - Laser joining of thermoplastic and non-thermoplastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/31] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charlson, Paul Marlin 1732 Drake St. Longmont Colorado 80501 / US | 02 /
Schwieters, Clarence Raymond 1126 Cascade St., N.W. Rochester, MN 55901 / US | 03 /
Souk, Jun Hyung 1214 29th Street, NW Rochester, MN 55901 / US | [1983/31] | Representative(s) | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/31] | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 82111121.8 | 02.12.1982 | [1983/31] | Priority number, date | US19820336650 | 04.01.1982 Original published format: US 336650 | [1983/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084631 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084631 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B29C65/16 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
B23K26/324 (EP,US);
B29C65/1629 (EP,US);
B29C65/567 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/47 (EP,US);
B29C66/54 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/73 (EP,US);
B29C66/7392 (EP,US);
B29C66/7394 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0838 (EP,US);
B29C65/1632 (EP,US);
B29C66/472 (EP,US);
B29C66/712 (EP,US);
B29K2069/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/712, B29C65/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/31] | B23K26/00, B29C27/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/31] | Title | German: | Verbinden von thermoplastischem mit nichtthermoplastischem Werkstoff durch Laserstrahl | [1983/31] | English: | Laser joining of thermoplastic and non-thermoplastic materials | [1983/31] | French: | Jonction à laser de matériau thermoplastique et non-thermoplastique | [1983/31] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/04] | 23.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE920919 (AEG); | [Y]DE1629207 (LEER IND LTD VAN); | [A]US3610874 (GAGLIANO FRANCIS PATRICK); | [AD]US3989778 (OSBORNE RICHARD F) |