EP0081759 - Apparatus for regulating the air-fuel ratio in an internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1989 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jundt, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Belschnerstrasse 24 D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Reischl, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Linzerstrasse 44 D-7000 Stuttgart 30 / DE | [1983/25] | Application number, filing date | 82111154.9 | 02.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | DE19813149136 | 11.12.1981 Original published format: DE 3149136 | [1983/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081759 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081759 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081759 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F02D35/00 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
F02D41/1479 (EP,US);
F02D41/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/25] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Regelung des Kraftstoff-Luftverhältnisses bei Brennkraftmaschinen | [1983/25] | English: | Apparatus for regulating the air-fuel ratio in an internal-combustion engine | [1983/25] | French: | Dispositif de régulation du rapport air-carburant dans les moteurs à combustion interne | [1983/25] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/25] | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 20.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Appeal following examination | 20.06.1987 | Appeal received | 20.06.1987 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.07.1987 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2707383 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [Y]GB2060177 (NISSAN MOTOR) |