blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0083735

EP0083735 - Magnesium-containing metallic granule for hydrogen storage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.1987
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.03.1987 [1987/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH
Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse
D-52425 Jülich / DE
[1983/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Welter, Jean-Marie, Dr.
Wirichbongardstrasse 53
D-5100 Aachen / DE
02 / Rudman, Peter, Prof.Dr.
321 Cupsaw Dr.
Ringwood, N.J. 07456 / US
[1983/29]
Application number, filing date82111220.803.12.1982
[1983/29]
Priority number, dateDE1981314783903.12.1981         Original published format: DE 3147839
[1983/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0083735
Date:20.07.1983
Language:DE
[1983/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0083735
Date:12.03.1986
Language:DE
[1986/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.1983
ClassificationIPC:C01B3/00
[1983/29]
CPC:
C01B3/0078 (EP,US); C01B3/0084 (EP,US); Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
Y10S420/90 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL [1983/29]
TitleGerman:Magnesiumhaltiges Metallgranulat zur Speicherung von Wasserstoff[1983/29]
English:Magnesium-containing metallic granule for hydrogen storage[1983/29]
French:Granulé métallique contenant du magnésium pour le stockage h'hydrogène[1983/29]
Examination procedure09.01.1984Examination requested  [1984/13]
12.06.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.02.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.1985Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
14.08.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.1985Fee for grant paid
11.11.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.12.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10]
Request for further processing for:30.11.1984Request for further processing filed
30.11.1984Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.12.1984Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.1985Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2441652  (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH])
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 95, Nr. 12, September 1981, Seite 159, Nr. 100548q, Columbus, Ohio, USA
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.