Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0082393
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.04.1991 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] |
28.04.1990 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] |
19.01.1988 |
First examination report |
|
10.01.1987 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.02.1987 [1987/09] |
10.01.1987 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.02.1987 [1987/09] |
25.07.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.09.1986 [1986/37] |
13.11.1985 |
Publication of search report |
published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] |
15.10.1985 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.12.1985 [1985/51] |
30.04.1983 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.06.1983 [1983/26] |