EP0082393 - Reinforced microporous membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden Connecticut 06450 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states Cuno Incorporated 400 Research Parkway Meriden Connecticut 06450 / US | ||
Former [1983/26] | For all designated states AMF INCORPORATED World Headquarters 777 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnes, Robert G. 631 Brownstone Ridge Meriden Connecticut / US | 02 /
Meyering, Mark T. 44 Powder Hill Rd. Middlefield Connecticut / US | [1983/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111272.9 | 06.12.1982 | [1983/26] | Priority number, date | US19810332068 | 18.12.1981 Original published format: US 332068 | [1983/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0082393 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0082393 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082393 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/00, B01D67/00, B32B5/00, C08J9/00, A61M1/00, C02F1/44, B32B27/12 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
A61L2/022 (EP);
B32B3/26 (US);
B01D61/147 (EP);
B01D63/061 (EP);
B01D69/1071 (EP,US);
B01D69/1212 (EP,US);
B01D71/56 (EP);
B29B15/125 (EP);
B29C70/086 (EP);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B29K2105/04 (EP);
B29K2105/045 (EP);
B29L2009/00 (EP);
B29L2031/14 (EP);
B29L2031/755 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1985/51] | B01D13/04, B32B5/00, C08J9/00, B01D31/00, A61M1/00, C02F1/44, B32B27/12 | ||
Former IPC [1983/26] | B01D13/04, B32B5/00, C08J9/00, B01D31/00, A61M1/00, C02F1/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/26] | Title | German: | Verstärkte mikroporöse Membran | [1983/26] | English: | Reinforced microporous membrane | [1983/26] | French: | Membrane microporeuse renforcée | [1983/26] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 20.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR799146 (ULTRA FILTRE D M S L); | [X]US2944017 (COTTON RICHARD A); | [A]DE1200782 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]AU463220B ; | [XD]EP0005536 (PALL CORP [US]) |