EP0081227 - Energy-selective X-ray recording and readout system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macovski, Albert 2505 Alpine Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states Macovski, Albert 2505 Alpine Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/24] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys.Rotermund B.Sc. Morgan, Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111277.8 | 06.12.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | US19810327770 | 07.12.1981 Original published format: US 327770 | [1983/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081227 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0081227 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G21K1/00, G01N23/04, H04N5/32 | [1983/24] | CPC: |
G21K1/00 (EP,US);
G01N23/043 (EP,US);
H05G1/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/24] | Title | German: | Energieselektives Röntgenaufnahme- und Wiedergabesystem | [1983/24] | English: | Energy-selective X-ray recording and readout system | [1983/24] | French: | Système d'enregistrement et de lecture par rayons X, avec sélection d'énergie | [1983/24] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/07] | 13.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3848130 (MACOVSKI A); | [A]US4247774 (BROOKS RODNEY A); | [A]US3766383 (HARRIS G, et al); | [AD]US4029963 (ALVAREZ ROBERT E, et al); | [A]GB2020939 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]US3965358 (MACOVSKI ALBERT) |