EP0081230 - Improved glass-filled thermoplastic resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BORG-WARNER CHEMICALS INC. International Center Parkersburg West Virginia 26101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | For all designated states BORG-WARNER CHEMICALS INC. International Center Parkersburg West Virginia 26101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falk, John Carl 3028 N. Long Chicago Illinois 60641 / US | 02 /
Khait, Klementina F. 4624 W. Washington Skokie Illinois 60076 / US | [1983/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/24] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111296.8 | 06.12.1982 | [1983/24] | Priority number, date | US19810328159 | 07.12.1981 Original published format: US 328159 | [1983/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0081230 | Date: | 15.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/00, C08L25/18, C08K7/14 | [1983/24] | CPC: |
C08K7/14 (EP,US);
C08L25/00 (EP,US);
C08L33/12 (EP,US);
C08L25/12 (EP,US);
C08L25/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L25/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C08L33/12, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/24] | Title | German: | Glasfaserverstärkte Thermoplastharze | [1983/24] | English: | Improved glass-filled thermoplastic resins | [1983/24] | French: | Matières thermoplastiques renforcées aux fibres de verre | [1983/24] | File destroyed: | 16.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/07] | 03.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/40] | 07.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4212697 [ ] (MATSUMOTO YOSHIKI [JP], et al); | GB2028853 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) |